Global Patent Index - EP 0920282 A4

EP 0920282 A4 2000-03-29 - PREFERENTIALLY INSULATED ELECTRODES AND METHODS FOR USE IN A HOLLOW VISCOUS FILLED WITH A PHYSIOLOGIC FLUID

Title (en)

PREFERENTIALLY INSULATED ELECTRODES AND METHODS FOR USE IN A HOLLOW VISCOUS FILLED WITH A PHYSIOLOGIC FLUID

Title (de)

VORZUGSWEISE ISOLIERTE ELEKTRODEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DIESER ELEKTRODENIN EINER, MIT PHYSIOLOGISCHER FLÜSSIGKEIT GEFÜLLTEN HOHLEN VISCERA

Title (fr)

ELECTRODES DE PREFERENCE ISOLEES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE CES DERNIERES DANS UN VISCERE CREUX REMPLI DE LIQUIDE PHYSIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0920282 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97933269 A

Priority

  • US 9711604 W
  • US 67841296 A
  • US 82290197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800070A1] The invention provides methods and apparatus for electro-surgically treating tissue within a hollow viscous which includes a physiologic fluid. According to one exemplary method, a surgical instrument (12) comprising an elongate shaft (16) having a proximal end, a distal end, and an active electrode (14) near the distal end, is introduced into the hollow viscous so that the active electrode is surrounded by the physiologic fluid. Current is then passed between the active electrode and a return electrode while focusing the current from the active electrode so that it passes through a desired region of tissue.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/39; A61B 18/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/42 (2006.01); A61B 18/12 (2006.01); A61B 18/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 18/149 (2013.01); A61B 18/1485 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00011 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00196 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00285 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00505 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00595 (2013.01); A61B 2018/00601 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1253 (2013.01); A61B 2018/126 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1412 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1472 (2013.01); A61B 2018/162 (2013.01); A61B 2018/1861 (2013.01); A61B 2090/3614 (2016.02); A61B 2090/3782 (2016.02); A61B 2218/002 (2013.01); A61B 2218/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800070 A1 19980108; EP 0920282 A1 19990609; EP 0920282 A4 20000329; JP 2000513970 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2000-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETHICON, INC.

2000-03-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/39 A, 7A 61B 18/14 B

1999-12-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6A 61B 17/39 A

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990120

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI