Global patent index - EP 0920297 B1

EP 0920297 B1 2000-07-12 - INVESTMENT COMPOUND FOR MOULDING TECHNICS IN DENTAL TECHNOLOGY, USE OF INVESTMENT COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

INVESTMENT COMPOUND FOR MOULDING TECHNICS IN DENTAL TECHNOLOGY, USE OF INVESTMENT COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

EINBETTMASSE FÜR DIE MODELLGUSSTECHNIK IN DER DENTALTECHNIK, VERWENDUNG DER EINBETTMASSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER EINBETTMASSE

Title (fr)

MELANGE DE REVETEMENT POUR LA COULEE DE MODELES EN DENTISTERIE, UTILISATION DUDIT MELANGE, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MELANGE DE REVETEMENT

Publication

EP 0920297 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937463 A

Priority

  • DE 9701899 W
  • DE 19635842 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9809604A1] The invention relates to an investment compound for moulding technics in dental technology comprising sand and a binding agent wherein the binding agent contains monoammonium phosphate (MAP) and magnesium oxide (MGO), as well as use of the investment compound and a method for the production of said compound. With known investment compounds in dental technology a long preheating period is required for the moulding muffle, which is produced with the compound, in order to reach a final temperature at which the moulding muffle can be cast. According to the invention an investment compound is created and can be placed directly in a pre-warmed furnace at a final temperature above 900 DEG C without causing any damage to the moulding muffle. A method for the production and use of the embedding compound are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 6/00; B22C 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9809604 A1 19980312; AT 194487 T 20000715; AU 4009297 A 19980326; EP 0920297 A1 19990609; EP 0920297 B1 20000712

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-10-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-12-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-09-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000902

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702020

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194487

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990921

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB