Global Patent Index - EP 0920564 B1

EP 0920564 B1 2002-11-06 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A DISPLACEABLE ELEMENT TO A GUIDE DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONNECTING A DISPLACEABLE ELEMENT TO A GUIDE DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES VERSCHIEBBAREN ELEMENTES MIT EINER FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR RELIER UN ELEMENT DEPLA ABLE A UN DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE

Publication

EP 0920564 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925380 A

Priority

  • CH 9800274 W
  • CH 153397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859140A1] The invention relates to a device (2) for connecting a displaceable element (1), especially a glass, metal or wooden panel to a guiding device (93; 93a), said guide device being guided in a rail (91; 91a). The inventive device comprises a first and a second fixing part (31; 41). Said fixing parts contain outer panels (32; 42) and fitting elements (33; 43) which can be interconnected by means of an axle (35). Said fitting elements (33; 43) are inserted into a cut out section (11) on the edge of the displaceable element (1) and interconnected. The fitting elements (33; 43) encompass a connection screw (6) which can be connected to the guide device (93; 93), said connection screw (6) having a screw shaft (63) with a screw head (62), a securing element (61) and a thread. The fitting element (33) of the first fixing part (31) has a channel (36) for receiving the screw shaft (63), said channel having channel walls (34), a trough (39) for receiving the screw head (62) and a cavity (37) for receiving the securing element (61). Said securing element (61) can be stopped by a stop screw (53; 53a). The fitting element (43) of the second fixing part (41) has a recess (44) for receiving the channel walls (34) and an opening through which the screw head (62) can be accessed. The assembled device is adjusted by loosening the stop screws (53) by a few turns and turning the connection screw (6) until the displaceable element (1) is set at the desired height. The stop screws (53) are then re-tightened. The securing element (61) is part of the connection screw (6) and is encompassed in the device (2) so that the top edge of the displaceable element (1) can be drawn practically up to the rail (91; 91a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/218 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/22 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/48 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/638 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/64 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/688 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/702 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/672 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/00 (2013.01); Y10T 16/35 (2013.01); Y10T 16/353 (2013.01); Y10T 16/3543 (2013.01); Y10T 16/3816 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859140 A1 19981230; WO 9859140 A9 20010201; AT 227387 T 20021115; AU 732336 B2 20010412; AU 7755498 A 19990104; CA 2263507 A1 19981230; CA 2263507 C 20070911; DE 59806174 D1 20021212; DK 0920564 T3 20030310; EP 0920564 A1 19990609; EP 0920564 B1 20021106; ES 2186167 T3 20030501; JP 2001503115 A 20010306; JP 3694034 B2 20050914; KR 100573463 B1 20060424; KR 20000068319 A 20001125; PT 920564 E 20030331; TW 357223 B 19990501; US 6052867 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170623

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170623

2018-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170623

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-03-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170623

2018-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 227387 T

- Effective date: 20170623

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806174

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150623

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-03-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150624

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110623

2012-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2011-12-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2010-07-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100610

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186167 T3

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806174 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RUTZ, ISLER & PARTNER

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227387 T 20021115

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990216

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE