Global Patent Index - EP 0920703 B1

EP 0920703 B1 2000-02-16 - MOVABLE CONTACT ARRANGEMENT FOR A LOW-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH A PIVOT BEARING

Title (en)

MOVABLE CONTACT ARRANGEMENT FOR A LOW-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH A PIVOT BEARING

Title (de)

BEWEGBARE KONTAKTANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN NIEDERSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINEM SCHWENKLAGER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONTACT MOBILE POUR DISJONCTEUR BASSE TENSION AVEC UN PALIER PIVOTANT

Publication

EP 0920703 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941834 A

Priority

  • DE 9701868 W
  • DE 19635366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19635366A1] The invention concerns a movable contact arrangement (10) for a low-voltage circuit breaker (11). The contact arrangement comprises a contact lever carrier (12) equipped with contact levers (13), and can be moved by a drive device (21) about a pivot bearing (23) for switching on and off. Integrally formed on a main arm (24) of the contact lever carrier (12) is a bearing journal (25) which engages in a bearing opening (26) close to the inner end of a stationary conductor part (17). The bearing journal (25) is disposed approximately centrally and its length is not greater than the width of the contact arrangement (10). The bearing opening (26) is also disposed within the width of the contact arrangement (10). As a result, the width of the circuit breaker (11) is reduced, in particular for multipole configurations and, at the same time, the loading capacity and useful life of the pivot bearing (23) are improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/22 (2006.01); H01H 73/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/226 (2013.01); H01H 73/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19635366 A1 19980226; EP 0920703 A1 19990609; EP 0920703 B1 20000216; JP 2001503557 A 20010313; US 6188031 B1 20010213; WO 9808240 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-10-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011022

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701142 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000216

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990705

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT