Global Patent Index - EP 0920822 A3

EP 0920822 A3 2000-06-07 - Assembly system for chair components

Title (en)

Assembly system for chair components

Title (de)

Montagesystem für Stuhlteile

Title (fr)

Système d'assemblage pour éléments de chaises

Publication

EP 0920822 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830320 A

Priority

IT BS970119 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920822A2] The present invention concerns a system of assembly of the components of a chair of the type made up of a load bearing frame (10), in metal, a backrest (11) and a seat (12). The backrest (11) has two tubular housings (17) formed in the rear, extending upwards and suitable for accepting two tubular support struts (16). Each of the housings has an aperture at the top for the inserting of a securing plug (19) which engages under pressure with the upper part of the respective struts so preventing the sliding and detaching of the backrest upwards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/00; A47C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/02 (2013.01); A47C 3/00 (2013.01); A47C 4/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920822 A2 19990609; EP 0920822 A3 20000607; IT 243696 Y1 20020305; IT BS970119 U1 19990604; IT BS970119 V0 19971204; PL 188088 B1 20041231; PL 326544 A1 19990607

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030123

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47C 3/00 A, 7A 47C 7/42 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI