Global Patent Index - EP 0920823 A3

EP 0920823 A3 2000-12-27 - Self-resetting active dynamic seat

Title (en)

Self-resetting active dynamic seat

Title (de)

Aktiv-dynamische, selbstrückstellende Sitzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Siège dynamico-actif à remise en équilibre automatique

Publication

EP 0920823 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122635 A

Priority

DE 19753465 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920823A2] The seat part and base are joined by a link (10) through which protrudes a support (22) whose top end is fixed to the seat part (40), and which has a side cantilevered part (221) fixed to the link. The link elements comprise a bottom link element movable on a support surface of the base part (50), and a top link element movable on a support surface formed by the upper side (52) of the bottom link element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 9/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920823 A2 19990609; EP 0920823 A3 20001227; DE 19753465 A1 19990617; DE 19753465 C2 20030807

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-10-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI