Global patent index - EP 0920890 A3

EP 0920890 A3 2000-01-12 - Device for recognising or finding symbols, letters or numbers

Title (en)

Device for recognising or finding symbols, letters or numbers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Erkennen oder Auffinden von Symbolen Buchstaben oder Zahlen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour reconnaître ou trouver des symboles, des lettres ou des nombres

Publication

EP 0920890 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122999 A

Priority

DE 19754325 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920890A2] The template (1) has a flat surface (2) with two parallel side edges (3,4), one of which serves as a stop for a document (5) to be handled. The side edge has a stop element (6) engaging with a side edge (7) of the document. The template has a long L-shaped cut-out (8) and this can be moved over symbols/ numbers (9) in a row. Pointers (10) located at even relative distances project into the cut-out, or the cut-out has associated fields. Each pointer or field is associated with a certain symbol/number.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/0625 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920890 A2 19990609; EP 0920890 A3 20000112; EP 0920890 B1 20030502; AT 238830 T 20030515; DE 19754325 A1 19990610; DE 19754325 C2 20000105; ES 2198637 T3 20040201; US 6305094 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 08

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061204

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061204

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061203

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061203

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061203

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-12-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051205

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-11-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051108

- Year of fee payment: 08

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2198637

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-07-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI