Global Patent Index - EP 0920893 A3

EP 0920893 A3 2001-03-21 - Pop-up board book

Title (en)

Pop-up board book

Title (de)

Buch aus Karton mit ausschwenkbarem Teil

Title (fr)

Livre cartonné comportant une partie mobile

Publication

EP 0920893 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309949 A

Priority

US 98513097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920893A2] A book (10) includes a page (18) which is fabricated from a first and a second sheet (18a, 18b). One face of the first sheet is attached to a face of the second sheet to form a two-ply page. A cut-out pop-up or removable portion (32) is formed in the first sheet. The cut-out portion can be assembled into a three-dimensional structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920893 A2 19990609; EP 0920893 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI