Global Patent Index - EP 0920920 A3

EP 0920920 A3 2000-12-27 - Spin-coating apparatus for preparing optical discs

Title (en)

Spin-coating apparatus for preparing optical discs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Schleuderbeschichtung zur Beschichtung von optischen Speicherplatten

Title (fr)

Appareil de revêtement par centrifugation pour le revêtement de disques optiques

Publication

EP 0920920 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309940 A

Priority

JP 35240697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920920A2] A spin-coating apparatus (10) for preparing optical discs (1) is composed of an applying device equipped with a nozzle (12) having a pointed end for giving a coating liquid onto a disc substrate (1), a rotatable spinner head (13) for keeping the substrate (1) horizontally, a round guard wall (15) provided around the spinner head (13) which has an opening (16) on its top and keeps the applied coating liquid within the guard wall (15), and an air exhaust system (18), wherein the nozzle (12) has a surface of polytetrafluoroethylene at least at the pointed end and on an inside and outside walls following the pointed end at a length of 1 mm or more. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/40 (2006.01); B05C 11/08 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920920 A2 19990609; EP 0920920 A3 20001227; EP 0920920 B1 20030507; DE 69814315 D1 20030612; DE 69814315 T2 20040122; JP H11165115 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69814315

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121204

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101110

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69814315

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 05C 11/08 A

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ISHIZUKA, SEIJI

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KATAGIRI, YOSHINOBU

2002-12-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUGIYAMA, TADASHI

2002-12-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SPIN-COATING APPARATUS FOR PREPARING OPTICAL DISCS

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011113

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI