Global Patent Index - EP 0920921 A3

EP 0920921 A3 2003-06-25 - Method of mixing solid materials or coating of surfaces

Title (en)

Method of mixing solid materials or coating of surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Mischen von Feststoffen oder Beschichten von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé de mélange pour matériaux solides ou pour enduire des surfaces

Publication

EP 0920921 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122094 A

Priority

DE 19753794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920921A2] The fluid is a chemically inert and electrically non-conducting material. The particles of at least two different solids, or the particles of at least one solid and a surface to be coated, have a different static charge. The fluid is a liquid or supercritical gas, e.g. liquid nitrogen or supercritical/liquid carbon dioxide, at a pressure of more than 1bar. The solid particles have an average diameter of 0,01 mu m to 50 mu m. After mixing, the gas is evaporated to create a dry product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 1/06; B01F 13/00; B01F 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/06 (2013.01); B05D 2401/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4383767 A 19830517 - JIDO MORIO [JP]
  • [X] GB 2075353 A 19811118 - SAPCO SYSTEMANALYSE PROJEKT
  • [X] SU 1033172 A1 19830807 - NII ELEKTRONNO IONNOJ T [SU] & DATABASE WPI Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1984-298958DATABASE WPI1Derwent World Patents Index1984-298958
  • [X] ELVERS, B., HAWKINS, S., AND SCHULZ, G.: "Ullmann's Encylopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5th Ed., Vol 18A", 1991, VCH, WEINHEIM, NEW YORK, XP002238229

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920921 A2 19990609; EP 0920921 A3 20030625; DE 19753794 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 05D 1/06 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 13/00 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 01F 3/18 B

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI