Global Patent Index - EP 0920922 A3

EP 0920922 A3 2000-12-27 - Method and device for separating foreign solid bodies from fluid, pasty, plastic or fine grained material

Title (en)

Method and device for separating foreign solid bodies from fluid, pasty, plastic or fine grained material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Abtrennung von festen Fremdkörpern aus einem flüssigen, pastösen, plastischen oder feinkörnigen Gut

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour séparer des corps étrangers solides d'une matière fluide, pateuse, plastique ou à grains fins

Publication

EP 0920922 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122855 A

Priority

DE 19754226 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920922A2] A device (I) for the separation of solid foreign bodies (II) from a liquid, paste, plastic or fine particulate material (III) comprises a driven cylindrical drum (13) having grooves in its peripheral surface (15) that are narrower than the dimensions of the foreign objects to be separated. One or more press components (16) are arranged behind the conveyor (26) and by means of at least their own weight stay in effective contact with the peripheral surface (15). A doctor blade (23) in effective contact with the peripheral surface (15) and a scraper (24) are engaged in the grooves of the drum (13). An Independent claim is included for a process for the separation of foreign bodies (II) from particulate material (III) by means of (I) whereby the material to be cleaned is brought as a thin layer onto the surface (15) of the drum (13) using the conveyor (26) and foreign bodies (II) outside of the grooves are removed by the doctor blade (23) and the cleaned material within the grooves is removed by the scraper (24) and fed away for further use.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/05; B07B 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01); B07B 13/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/05 (2013.01); B05B 15/1266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920922 A2 19990609; EP 0920922 A3 20001227; EP 0920922 B1 20020828; DE 19754226 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805301

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-02-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805301

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110111

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805301 20021002

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 07B 13/05 A, 7B 07B 1/15 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI