Global Patent Index - EP 0920936 B1

EP 0920936 B1 2003-06-18 - Mould for continuous casting

Title (en)

Mould for continuous casting

Title (de)

Kokille zum Stranggiessen

Title (fr)

Lingotière pour la coulée continue

Publication

EP 0920936 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122281 A

Priority

DE 19753537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0920936A2] Within the funnel region of the mold, the inner contours of the mold broad side walls from the mold top to its outlet edge have a convex shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04; B22D 11/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0408 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0920936 A2 19990609; EP 0920936 A3 20000426; EP 0920936 B1 20030618; AT 243082 T 20030715; CA 2255279 A1 19990603; CA 2255279 C 20070213; CN 1187144 C 20050202; CN 1223917 A 19990728; DE 19753537 A1 19990610; ES 2205367 T3 20040501; JP H11244996 A 19990914; MY 131906 A 20070928; TW 380065 B 20000121; US 2002000305 A1 20020103; US 6390176 B1 20020521; ZA 9810910 B 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161124

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161124

2017-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243082 T

- Effective date: 20161124

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808750

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE; THYSSENKRUPP ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., TERNI, IT

- Document: DE 59808750

2015-09-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., IT

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE; THYSSENKRUPP ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A., TERNI, IT

- Document: DE 59808750

2015-09-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808750

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041124

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205367 T3

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-09 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031124

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-10-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808750 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACCIAI SPECIALI TERNI S.P.A.

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 11/04 A, 7B 22D 11/057 B

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981204

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI