Global Patent Index - EP 0921075 A3

EP 0921075 A3 2001-03-21 - Bottle crate with crown cap opener

Title (en)

Bottle crate with crown cap opener

Title (de)

Getränkekasten mit Kronenkorkenöffner

Title (fr)

Casier à bouteilles avec décapsuleur de capsules à couronne

Publication

EP 0921075 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122421 A

Priority

DE 19753420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921075A2] The carton (1), for bottles, is fitted with a bottle top opener (13) within a hollowed space (8). It is attached to the carton wall, where a tab at the outer surface can be used to expose a window opening (15) through the carton wall for access to the bottle opener (13). The access opening to the opener (13) has a dia. of 35 mm. The bottle top opener (13) is held in place mechanically by rivets, screws, pins, clips (14) and the like, at the front wall of the carton (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/24; B65D 85/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/243 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24019 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24082 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24127 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24541 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24808 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24917 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921075 A2 19990609; EP 0921075 A3 20010321; DE 19753420 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001201

2003-01-08 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT

2002-03-13 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20010424

2002-03-13 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-01-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI