Global Patent Index - EP 0921084 B1

EP 0921084 B1 2002-09-25 - Winding apparatus for a slitter rewinder

Title (en)

Winding apparatus for a slitter rewinder

Title (de)

Wickelvorrichtung für einen Rollenschneider

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage pour une bobineuse-refendeuse

Publication

EP 0921084 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121068 A

Priority

DE 19753871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921084A1] At least one gripper (30, 31) is provided in each reeling position, movable jointly in an axial direction with a block (24, 25) and having a gripping head (33, 34). The gripping head can grip and retain a reel core (5) and can move from the supply web to the bearing spindle (19, 20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22; B65H 19/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 19/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2284 (2013.01); B65H 19/2238 (2013.01); B65H 19/305 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414863 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41826 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921084 A1 19990609; EP 0921084 B1 20020925; DE 19753871 A1 19990617; US 6089495 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041106

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041106

2004-11-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041106

2003-12-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-10-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805675 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

1999-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990529

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI