Global Patent Index - EP 0921085 A3

EP 0921085 A3 2000-05-31 - Method of and winding machine for continuously winding a material web

Title (en)

Method of and winding machine for continuously winding a material web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Wickelmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine d'enroulage pour enrouler en continu une bande de matière

Publication

EP 0921085 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121261 A

Priority

US 98694097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921085A2] The pressure drum (35) is mounted on an elevating platform so as to rotate. A guide (39) for the reel has guide rails (41) parallel to a horizontal line. The pressure drum is positioned on the elevating platform on a conveyor (13) which can be horizontally displaced by a hoist (17). The drum is held by a guide carriage (23) displaced horizontally by a pressure appliance (25). First and second (51,53) drives apply torque to the winder reel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/2207 (2013.01); B65H 19/2253 (2013.01); B65H 2301/31622 (2013.01); B65H 2403/52 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2408/237 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921085 A2 19990609; EP 0921085 A3 20000531; EP 0921085 B1 20030423; AT 238217 T 20030515; DE 19818816 A1 19990610; DE 59808045 D1 20030528; US 5931406 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081108

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808045 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI