Global patent index - EP 0921232 A3

EP 0921232 A3 2001-01-03 - A device for keeping sections, for example fencing, in an upright position

Title (en)

A device for keeping sections, for example fencing, in an upright position

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung von Elementen, z.B. Zaunelement, in eine senkrechte Position

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour maintenir des sections, par exemple de clôture, en une position verticale

Publication

EP 0921232 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204088 A

Priority

NL 1007714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921232A2] The invention relates to a device for keeping sections, such as fencing, in an upright position, which device comprises a base part on which or in which one or more posts can be placed. The device distinguishes itself in that the base part is made up of two heavy elements (2), which are interconnected by a light and rigid connecting piece (1), which can also function as a handgrip. The heavy elements are provided with one or more facilities which function to receive thereon or therein a post of the section to be kept upright. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 9/012; E04H 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/692 (2016.02); E01F 9/688 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921232 A2 19990609; EP 0921232 A3 20010103; NL 1007714 C1 19990608

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040217

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030804

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 01F 9/012 A, 7E 04H 12/22 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI