Global Patent Index - EP 0921246 A3

EP 0921246 A3 2000-11-15 - Variable under-roof construction for steep pitched roofs

Title (en)

Variable under-roof construction for steep pitched roofs

Title (de)

Variable Unterdachkonstruktion für Steildächer

Title (fr)

Construction de sous-toiture variable pour toit à forte pente

Publication

EP 0921246 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122672 A

Priority

DE 19753940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921246A2] Retaining angles fixed in the joins parallel to the ridge between the insulation plates on the roof rafters are connected together with system supports (1) fitted with fixable sliding members (19). The sliding members have fixing plates (21) to produce a positive connection between the sliding member and system support. Empty spaces are provided on the supports into which the head parts (22) of the fixing plates engage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/20; E04D 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921246 A2 19990609; EP 0921246 A3 20001115; DE 19753940 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/20 A, 7E 04D 12/00 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI