Global patent index - EP 0921247 A3

EP 0921247 A3 2000-11-15 - Underroof construction for steep-pitched roof

Title (en)

Underroof construction for steep-pitched roof

Title (de)

Unterdachkonstruktion für Steildächer

Title (fr)

Construction de sous-toiture pour toit à forte pente

Publication

EP 0921247 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122673 A

Priority

DE 19753941 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921247A2] The insulating plates are laid side by side in the joins between the roof battens, which run parallel to the ridge. Retaining angles are formed as system supports (1) extending over the entire insulating plates (13) form joints. The support has a system anchor (2) for fixing onto the roof rafters, a joining part (4) and a support (7). The eave ends of the system supports are hung in the ridge ends of the adjoining system supports, and the insulating plates have grooves with double tongues in the join areas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/20; E04D 12/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04D 12/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/3602 (2013.01); E04D 12/006 (2013.01); E04D 13/1618 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921247 A2 19990609; EP 0921247 A3 20001115; DE 19753941 A1 19990610

INPADOC legal status

2001-12-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 7/20 A, 7E 04D 12/00 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB LI SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI