Global Patent Index - EP 0921255 B1

EP 0921255 B1 2003-06-25 - Modular transportable prefabricated shelter

Title (en)

Modular transportable prefabricated shelter

Title (de)

Vorgefertigter transportierbarer modularer Schutzraum

Title (fr)

Abri modulaire préfabriqué transportable

Publication

EP 0921255 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98402257 A

Priority

FR 9714157 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770866A1] The transportable prefabricated modular shelter comprises a deck capable of being selectively moved from a suspended position under the shelter floor to a projecting service position overhanging the side wall. An access door (4) is in the side wall and a platform (40), carried by the deck, which can be moved to a service position transverse to the deck. The platform has a strike plate in its longitudinal edge which receives a lock bolt provided under the deck for retaining the platform.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 1/1205 (2013.01); E04B 2001/34892 (2013.01); E04H 2001/1283 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770866 A1 19990514; FR 2770866 B1 19991203; DE 69815798 D1 20030731; DE 69815798 T2 20040429; DE 921255 T1 19991104; EP 0921255 A1 19990609; EP 0921255 B1 20030625; ES 2133262 T1 19990916; ES 2133262 T3 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100915

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69815798

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALGECO

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-07 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090911

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090904

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2133262 T3

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815798 P 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010821

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

1999-11-04 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1999-09-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2133262 T1

1999-08-04 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1999-07-14 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI CASETTA & PERANI S.P.A.

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI