Global Patent Index - EP 0921297 A3

EP 0921297 A3 2000-06-21 - Internal combustion multi-cylinder piston engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion multi-cylinder piston engine

Title (de)

Kolbenbrennkraftmaschine, insbesondere mehrzylindrige Kolbenbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur multi-cylindres à pistons à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0921297 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121886 A

Priority

DE 19754007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754007C1] The engine has a lower crankcase section (1) with tubular reinforcing beams (4,5) extending parallel to the crankshaft axis. The beams are connected by a bearing trunnion integral with the crankcase.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F01M 1/02; F01M 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01M 1/12 (2006.01); F01M 11/03 (2006.01); F01M 13/02 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/0007 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01M 1/12 (2013.01); F01M 11/03 (2013.01); F01M 13/02 (2013.01); F01M 2001/123 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1812 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754007 C1 19990520; EP 0921297 A2 19990609; EP 0921297 A3 20000621; EP 0921297 B1 20040107

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20050907

2006-01-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20050907

2004-11-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041112

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DR. ING. H.C.F. PORSCHE AG

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810543

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030109

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 7/00 A, 7F 01M 1/02 B, 7F 01M 1/12 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI