Global Patent Index - EP 0921359 A3

EP 0921359 A3 2001-05-16 - Boiler casing with casing for heating circuit controller

Title (en)

Boiler casing with casing for heating circuit controller

Title (de)

Heizkesselumschliessungsgehäuse mit Heizkreisreglergehäuse

Title (fr)

Enveloppe de chaudière avec enveloppe pour un régulateur de circuit de chauffage

Publication

EP 0921359 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122829 A

Priority

DE 19754266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921359A2] The housing comprises two hinged (4) parts (1,2) with a separating plane extending horizontally between the parts. The upper half includes heating circuit controls (RE) and indicators (BA). The lower half encloses the power supply circuits (SN). A rod holds the case open (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20; F24H 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2006.01); F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/02 (2013.01); F24H 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921359 A2 19990609; EP 0921359 A3 20010516; EP 0921359 B1 20050223; DE 19754266 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VIESSMANN WERKE G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812594 P 20050331

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

2005-02-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUECKER, LUDOLF

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIESSMANN WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT NL

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI