Global Patent Index - EP 0921500 B1

EP 0921500 B1 2002-09-11 - Coin escrow

Title (en)

Coin escrow

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Anordnung zum Speichern von Münzen mit deren Zwischenspeicherung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour stocker temporairement des pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0921500 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810950 A

Priority

EP 97810950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921500A1] The arrangement for temporary storage of coins has a construction of only three parts with a base unit, a one-piece cover (3) and a one-piece container rim (5) for temporary coin storage which is rotatable about its central axis (6) and held securely only by the cover and base parts without further driving or holding parts. The rim is fully enclosed up to coin input and output slots (7,15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 1/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921500 A1 19990609; EP 0921500 B1 20020911; DE 59708206 D1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171204

2017-12-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171204

2017-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-12-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708206

2017-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: XEROX BUSINESS SERVICES (SWITZERLAND) AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ACS SOLUTIONS SCHWEIZ AG, BERN, CH

- Document: DE 59708206

2017-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59708206

- Representative's name: LENZING GERBER STUTE PARTNERSCHAFTSGESELLSCHAF, DE

2017-06-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: XEROX BUSINESS SERVICES (SWITZERLAND) AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ACS SOLUTIONS SCHWEIZ AG, CH

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2006-10-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-08-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-08-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ACS SOLUTIONS SCHWEIZ AG

- Free text: ASCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#BELPSTRASSE 37#3000 BERN 14 (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ACS SOLUTIONS SCHWEIZ AG#FRANKENSTRASSE 70#3018 BERN (CH)

2006-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ASCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Free text: ASCOM AUTELCA AG#WORBSTRASSE 201#3073 GUEMLIGEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- ASCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#BELPSTRASSE 37#3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-18 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708206 20021017

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEGENTHALER, FRITZ

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNHARD, FRITZ

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CASADIO, PAOLO

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990710

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI