Global Patent Index - EP 0921539 A3

EP 0921539 A3 2000-05-10 - Low-voltage contacts for high- and very high-intensity currents, particularly for electric transformers

Title (en)

Low-voltage contacts for high- and very high-intensity currents, particularly for electric transformers

Title (de)

Niederspannungs-Kontaktanordnungen für hohe und sehr hohe Ströme, insbesondere für elektrische Transformatoren

Title (fr)

Contacts à basse tension pour courants de forte et très forte intensité, en particulier pour transformateurs électriques

Publication

EP 0921539 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98203865 A

Priority

IT MI972577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921539A2] A low-voltage contact for high- and very high-intensity currents, particularly for electric transformers, comprising a body (2) made of aluminum and/or alloys thereof which has a substantially constant transverse cross-section and a length which is a function of the intensity of the current that affects the low-voltage contact. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/04; H01F 27/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921539 A2 19990609; EP 0921539 A3 20000510; IT 1296470 B1 19990625; IT MI972577 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI