Global Patent Index - EP 0921599 A3

EP 0921599 A3 2000-07-26 - Electrical connector and contacts used therein

Title (en)

Electrical connector and contacts used therein

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder und darin verwendete Kontakts

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique et contacts utilisés dans ce connecteur

Publication

EP 0921599 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309815 A

Priority

JP 35242097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921599A2] An electrical connector allows for easy removal of electrical contacts from a housing even if the contacts are arranged in multiple rows. Electrical connector (1) comprises a housing (10) having contact-receiving cavities (11) arranged in multiple rows and multiple electrical contacts (20) disposed in the contact-receiving cavities (11). Each contact (20) includes a contact section (21) intended to form electrical connection with a mating contact, a wire-connecting section (22) located behind the contact section (21) and a retention device (23) engaging with a retention lug (17) of the housing (10). The retention device (23) comprises two spring-loaded lances (24) that are arranged along an axis of the contact and they can be bent to left and right directions. The retention device (23) is located near a front end of the contact section (21), and the housing (10) has recesses (18) for the insertion of a retention-release tool extending from the front surface (14) of the housing (10) to the retention device (23). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/428

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/22 (2006.01); H01R 13/42 (2006.01); H01R 13/428 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/428 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921599 A2 19990609; EP 0921599 A3 20000726; JP H11167951 A 19990622

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010127

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI