Global Patent Index - EP 0921610 A3

EP 0921610 A3 2001-05-16 - Electrical connector assembly for mounting on a printed circuit board and method for mounting it

Title (en)

Electrical connector assembly for mounting on a printed circuit board and method for mounting it

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbinderanordnung zur Montage auf einer Leiterplatte und Verfahren zur deren Montage

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connexion électrique pour montage sur une carte de circuits imprimés et procede pour son montage

Publication

EP 0921610 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98122856 A

Priority

SG 1997004291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0921610A2] An electrical connector assembly for facilitating mounting an electrical connector on a top surface of a printed circuit board. A connector housing is adapted for mounting at the edge of the circuit board. A plurality of terminals are mounted on the housing, with tail portions of the terminals projecting from the housing for solder termination to the top surface of the circuit board. A removable cover is mounted on the housing and includes a support arm portion projecting from the housing and adapted for engagement with a bottom surface of the printed circuit board. With the circuit board so positioned, the board is sandwiched between the tail portions of the terminals and the support arm portion of the cover at the edge of the board. A method of fabricating an electrical connector and circuit board assembly is also disclosed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 23/70; H01R 13/52; H01R 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 43/02 (2006.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/727 (2013.01); H01R 12/7047 (2013.01); H01R 13/5213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0921610 A2 19990609; EP 0921610 A3 20010516; CN 1221241 A 19990630; JP 3082081 B2 20000828; JP H11238536 A 19990831; KR 19990062762 A 19990726; SG 78280 A1 20010220; TW 419145 U 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010703

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 23/70 A, 7H 01R 43/02 B, 7H 01R 13/52 B

1999-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI