Global Patent Index - EP 0921733 B1

EP 0921733 B1 2002-11-06 - FINGER GLOVE

Title (en)

FINGER GLOVE

Title (de)

HANDSCHUH

Title (fr)

GANT A DOIGTS

Publication

EP 0921733 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97932107 A

Priority

  • SE 9701225 W
  • SE 9602698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9801044A1] Gloves produced from pieces of leather, textile, polymer materials or combinations thereof in such a way that one or more of the fingers of the glove have seams or joints only on the sides of the fingertip and on the dorsal or volar side of the finger but lack seams on those surfaces which correspond to the volar and distal surfaces of the outer phalanxes. The volar parts of the glove fingers can, for instance, be cut so long that the seam between the volar and dorsal parts of the gloval fingers is located on the dorsal sides of the fingers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0669085 A2 19950830 - FRANZ ZIENER GMBH & CO LEDERHA [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801044 A1 19980115; AT 227090 T 20021115; AU 3564697 A 19980202; DE 69716928 D1 20021212; DE 69716928 T2 20031009; EP 0921733 A1 19990616; EP 0921733 B1 20021106; SE 513047 C2 20000626; SE 9602698 D0 19960704; SE 9602698 L 19980105

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69716928

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69716928 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227090 T 20021115

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990304

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI SE