Global Patent Index - EP 0921865 B1

EP 0921865 B1 2001-01-17 - FLAT SIFTER

Title (en)

FLAT SIFTER

Title (de)

PLANSICHTER

Title (fr)

BLUTEUR HORIZONTAL

Publication

EP 0921865 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97922804 A

Priority

  • CH 9700227 W
  • CH 204296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807529A1] This invention concerns a flat sifter with self-supporting structure which is preferably used for sifting grain and flour-like products in mills. The aim is to markedly simplify the construction and assembly of such a flat sifter while improving the sanitary conditions. That aim is achieved by combining one or several double compartments, which are mounted laterally adjacent to one another, with a universal drive unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/38; B07B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/38 (2006.01); B07B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/46 (2013.01); B07B 1/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807529 A1 19980226; AT 198716 T 20010215; CN 1072986 C 20011017; CN 1225596 A 19990811; DE 59702932 D1 20010222; EP 0921865 A1 19990616; EP 0921865 B1 20010117; ES 2154041 T3 20010316; JP 2000516845 A 20001219; JP 4001924 B2 20071031; RU 2165803 C2 20010427; TR 9802567 T2 19990521; US 6260710 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090605

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BUHLER A.G.

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154041 T3

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702932 20010222

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198716 T 20010215

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000411

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981024

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE