Global patent index - EP 0921866 A4

EP 0921866 A4 2000-01-19 - DRY PHYSICAL SEPARATION OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL

Title (en)

DRY PHYSICAL SEPARATION OF PARTICULATE MATERIAL

Title (de)

TROCKENPHYSIKALISCHE TRENNUNG VON KÖRNIGEN MATERIAL

Title (fr)

SEPARATION PHYSIQUE A SEC DE MATIERE PARTICULAIRE

Publication

EP 0921866 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97933594 A

Priority

  • AU 9700507 W
  • AU PO156996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806513A1] An apparatus for dry physical separation of particulate material comprises an inclined separating surface having upper and lower edges, oscillation means for inducing non-linear oscillatory motion of the separating surface, and introduction means for introducing the particulate material onto the separating surface between the upper and lower edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806513 A1 19980219; AU PO156996 D0 19960905; DE 69725590 D1 20031120; DE 69725590 T2 20040805; EP 0921866 A1 19990616; EP 0921866 A4 20000119; EP 0921866 B1 20031015; ZA 9707190 B 19980212

INPADOC legal status

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69725590

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120811

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120811

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120812

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120811

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110811

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-10-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69725590

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20031120

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990312

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE