Global Patent Index - EP 0921879 B1

EP 0921879 B1 2000-07-12 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A GEAR PART WITH OUTER TEETH

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A GEAR PART WITH OUTER TEETH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AUSSEN VERZAHNTEN GETRIEBETEILES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UNE PARTIE D'ENGRENAGE A DENTURE EXTERIEURE

Publication

EP 0921879 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96937179 A

Priority

  • DE 9601641 W
  • DE 19632704 A
  • DE 19635152 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806521A1] A process is disclosed for manufacturing a gear part with outer teeth from a metallic workpiece shaped as a circular blank or predrawing. The gear part has a hub surface with outward projecting teeth. The workpiece is flattened in its circumferential area and the teeth are formed without cutting in a toothed roller (5) mounted in a freely rotary manner. While the teeth are formed by flattening the workpiece, the toothed roller (5) is fixed in the radial direction so as to not move towards the feeding axis of the spindle. The edge of a circular blank may be curled or thickened or the cylindrical edge of a pot-shaped predrawing may be collapsed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/28 (2006.01); B21H 5/00 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01); B21H 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 5/02 (2013.01); B21D 53/28 (2013.01); B21H 1/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49471 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806521 A1 19980219; CA 2263408 A1 19980219; EP 0921879 A1 19990616; EP 0921879 B1 20000712; ES 2148807 T3 20001016; JP 2000515812 A 20001128; JP 3840264 B2 20061101; US 6161409 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-10-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051004

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-09-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-09-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050903

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148807 T3

2000-10-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605606 20000817

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990128

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE