Global Patent Index - EP 0921946 B1

EP 0921946 B1 2000-05-10 - CYLINDER DRIVE

Title (en)

CYLINDER DRIVE

Title (de)

ZYLINDERANTRIEB

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEMENT DE CYLINDRE

Publication

EP 0921946 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97936583 A

Priority

  • DE 9701632 W
  • DE 19632292 A
  • DE 19648413 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806581A1] The proposed cylinder (2) may be adjusted through an eccentric bush (7) and is directly driven by an electric motor (11) mounted directly on said eccentric bush. A clutch (12) is inserted between the electric motor and the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01); H02K 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2213/126 (2013.01); B41P 2213/25 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806581 A1 19980219; DE 59701665 D1 20000615; EP 0921946 A1 19990616; EP 0921946 B1 20000510; EP 0921946 B2 20040331; JP 2000502627 A 20000307; JP 3357074 B2 20021216; US 6118195 A 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-05-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701665

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130831

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130801

2014-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120806

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120903

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-11-05 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-06-02 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2004-04-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2004-03-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701665 20000615

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991022

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990223

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI