Global Patent Index - EP 0921951 B1

EP 0921951 B1 2000-10-11 - INFORMATION SYSTEM DISPLAY PANEL

Title (en)

INFORMATION SYSTEM DISPLAY PANEL

Title (de)

SICHTTAFEL FÜR INFORMATIONSSYSTEME

Title (fr)

PANNEAU DE VISUALISATION POUR SYSTEMES D'INFORMATION

Publication

EP 0921951 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97935463 A

Priority

  • DE 9701551 W
  • DE 29613107 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2261118A1] The invention concerns an information system display panel with a plastics frame surrounding two transparent foils (4, 5) that form an envelope. The frame (1) is composed of two halves interconnected by locking couplings such that peripheral weld seams can be dispensed with.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29613107 U1 19960926; AT 196881 T 20001015; AU 3846497 A 19980210; AU 720408 B2 20000601; CA 2261118 A1 19980129; CA 2261118 C 20050614; DK 0921951 T3 20010108; EP 0921951 A1 19990616; EP 0921951 B1 20001011; ES 2152694 T3 20010201; US 6176029 B1 20010123; WO 9803351 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170716

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-07-24 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20170717

2017-07-19 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170716

2017-07-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59702465

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160715

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: "DURABLE" HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KOMMANDI, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DURABLE HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KG, 58636 ISERLOHN, DE

- Document: DE 59702465

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702465

- Representative's name: BECKORD & NIEDLICH PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

- Effective date: 20140114

2014-01-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59702465

- Representative's name: BECKORD & NIEDLICH PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DURABLE HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KG.

- Free text: DURABLE HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KG.#WESTFALENSTRASSE 77-79#58636 ISERLOHN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DURABLE HUNKE & JOCHHEIM GMBH & CO. KG.#WESTFALENSTRASSE 77-79#58636 ISERLOHN (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152694 T3

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-01-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702465 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196881 T 20001015

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990115

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE