Global Patent Index - EP 0921991 B1

EP 0921991 B1 2000-11-02 - DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR PRODUCTS ON SALE

Title (en)

DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR PRODUCTS ON SALE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR VERKAUFSPRÄSENTATION VON PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PRESENTATION POUR PRODUITS A LA VENTE

Publication

EP 0921991 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97936700 A

Priority

  • DE 19633434 A
  • EP 9704355 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19633434A1] The present invention concerns a card with cut portions for displaying products for sale. At least one of the cut portions (2) is designed such that the portions (6, 7) projecting from the product (5) engage into the opposite stamped hook portions, thus enabling form-closed snapping of the display card. The spacing between opposing edges of the cut portions is equal to the hook base spacing but smaller than the hook tip spacing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 73/0042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FI FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19633434 A1 19980226; DE 19633434 C2 19980806; AT 197272 T 20001115; EP 0921991 A1 19990616; EP 0921991 B1 20001102; WO 9807637 A1 19980226

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-10-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020811

2002-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020811

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010813

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010810

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010806

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702575 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197272 T 20001115

1999-12-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DISPLAY SYSTEM FOR PRODUCTS ON SALE

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990628

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990212

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR