Global Patent Index - EP 0922139 B1

EP 0922139 B1 2001-12-12 - PROCESS FOR ELIMINATION OF PAPER DEFECTS IN CONTINUOUS PAPER PRODUCTION

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR ELIMINATION OF PAPER DEFECTS IN CONTINUOUS PAPER PRODUCTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BESEITIGUNG VON PAPIERFEHLERN BEI DER KONTINUIERLICHEN PAPIERHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ELIMINER DES DEFAUTS DANS LE PAPIER LORS DE LA PRODUCTION DE PAPIER EN CONTINU

Publication

EP 0922139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937503 A

Priority

  • DE 19632988 A
  • EP 9703859 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632988C1] A process for elimination of paper defects during continuous paper production which reduces time lost due to defect correction has the following steps: a) recognition and localization of the paper defect by means of sensors (5) directed at the running paper web (4); b) detection or calculation of the speed of the paper web (4) between the sensor (5) and a station (6) for defect correction positioned downstream from the sensor (5); c) on the basis of the speed of the paper web, calculation of the arrival time of the web segment with the paper defect at the station (6) for defect correction; d) before arrival of the web segment with the paper defect at the station (6) for defect correction, reduction of the web segment speed to a lower value than normal speed or to zero, e) automatic removal of the paper defect in station (6) for defect correction and f) restoring the web section to normal speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00; B65H 26/02; B65H 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 26/02 (2006.01); B65H 37/02 (2006.01); B65H 43/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632988 C1 19980122; AT 210762 T 20011215; BR 9714336 A 20000411; CA 2263211 A1 19980219; CA 2263211 C 20060418; CN 1104526 C 20030402; CN 1228132 A 19990908; CZ 297849 B6 20070411; CZ 9900488 A3 19990714; EP 0922139 A1 19990616; EP 0922139 B1 20011212; ES 2165084 T3 20020301; ID 17869 A 19980205; JP 2001502648 A 20010227; KR 20000029927 A 20000525; NO 313558 B1 20021021; NO 990605 A 19990209; NO 990605 D0 19990209; PL 184169 B1 20020930; PL 331586 A1 19990719; PT 922139 E 20020429; RU 2166017 C2 20010427; WO 9806897 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090720

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100118

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090718

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER A.G.

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-01-26 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100118

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080711

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#FELDMUEHLEPLATZ 1#40545 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#FELDMUEHLEPLATZ 1#40545 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020314

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165084 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705791 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990208

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210762 T 20011215

2001-07-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-06-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990208

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990208