Global Patent Index - EP 0922143 B1

EP 0922143 B1 2001-05-23 - TRACK AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A RAIL TRACK SECTION

Title (en)

TRACK AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A RAIL TRACK SECTION

Title (de)

GLEIS SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUSRICHTEN EINES SCHIENENABSCHNITTS EINES GLEISES

Title (fr)

VOIE ET PROCEDE D'AJUSTEMENT D'UNE SECTION DE RAIL D'UNE VOIE

Publication

EP 0922143 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939532 A

Priority

  • DE 19727797 A
  • EP 9803890 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727797C1] The invention relates to a track with rail track section (10) which differs from the usual basic layout. In order to check changes in track layout in a simple manner, the invention provides that the rail track section (10) has a cutout (24) running parallel to the basic layout in a longitudinal direction of the track. When the rail track section is placed parallel to the basic layout, the layout of said cutout is inversely the same as that of the desired change in layout.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/00; E01B 5/18; E01B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 5/18 (2006.01); E01B 7/00 (2006.01); E01B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/20 (2013.01); E01B 5/18 (2013.01); E01B 7/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727797 C1 19981217; AT 201467 T 20010615; AU 8801198 A 19990125; DK 0922143 T3 20010910; EP 0922143 A1 19990616; EP 0922143 B1 20010523; ES 2158690 T3 20010901; NO 312599 B1 20020603; NO 990957 A 19990427; NO 990957 D0 19990226; US 6270018 B1 20010807; WO 9901616 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BWG GMBH & CO. KG

2001-09-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158690 T3

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-06-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800753 20010628

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201467 T 20010615

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TRACK AND METHOD FOR ADJUSTING A RAIL TRACK SECTION

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990224

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE