Global Patent Index - EP 0922145 A4

EP 0922145 A4 2001-01-24 - HOLLOW BUILDING BLOCK AND PROTECTIVE WALL CONSTRUCTION THEREWITH

Title (en)

HOLLOW BUILDING BLOCK AND PROTECTIVE WALL CONSTRUCTION THEREWITH

Title (de)

HOHLBAUSTEIN UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE SCHUTZWAND

Title (fr)

BLOC DE CONSTRUCTION CREUX ET CONSTRUCTION D'UN MUR DE PROTECTION A L'AIDE DE CES BLOCS

Publication

EP 0922145 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97927354 A

Priority

  • IL 9700207 W
  • IL 12005897 A
  • US 67329396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800612A1] A lightweight hollow building block (2, 10) for constructing a blast resistant and gas impermeable barrier wall (1) comprising oppositely disposed spaced apart walls (12, 14, 32, 34) connected by bridging elements (16) forming interconnected horizontal and vertical voids (13, 19, 40) characterized in that the walls (12, 14, 32, 34) are formed of a mixture of mineralized wood shavings and concrete having a density of no more than approximately 1 ton per cubic meter and bridging elements (16) are gas impermeable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/04; E04B 2/86; E04H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/02 (2006.01); E04B 1/04 (2006.01); E04B 2/16 (2006.01); E04B 2/26 (2006.01); E04B 2/54 (2006.01); E04B 2/86 (2006.01); E04H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/26 (2013.01); E04B 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2/54 (2013.01); E04B 2/8617 (2013.01); E04B 2/8647 (2013.01); E04H 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800612 A1 19980108; AU 3188197 A 19980121; AU 711337 B2 19991014; CN 1109168 C 20030521; CN 1223708 A 19990721; EP 0922145 A1 19990616; EP 0922145 A4 20010124; JP 2000513420 A 20001010; JP 3558650 B2 20040825; KR 20000022169 A 20000425; TR 9802726 T2 19990322

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-02 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1022006

2003-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/04 A, 7E 04B 2/86 B, 7E 04H 9/10 B

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE