Global Patent Index - EP 0922194 B1

EP 0922194 B1 2002-11-20 - SHOOTING TRAINING AND COMPETITION

Title (en)

SHOOTING TRAINING AND COMPETITION

Title (de)

SCHIESSÜBUNG UND -WETTKAMPF

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEMENT ET COMPETITION DE TIR

Publication

EP 0922194 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97936767 A

Priority

  • GB 9702166 W
  • GB 9617036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806997A1] A training method for clay pigeon shooting comprising the steps of: providing relative to a shooting position (12) a plurality of clay launching devices (T1-T7), each device in the plurality providing for the launch of a clay along a path (P1-P7) having a unique degree of difficulty or other criteria as a target for a shooter (13) at the shooting position (12), each launcher (T1-T7) being adapted to provide a clay distinguishable from a clay from any other launcher (T1-T7) such as by colour or pattern; locating a shooter (13) at the shooting position (12); selecting a pair of launchers from the plurality (T1-T7) from which target clays are to be launched at call; causing the first launcher (T1-T7) and second launcher (T1-T7) of the pair to launch, respectively, their distinguishable clays; causing the shooter (13) to fire at the distinguishable clay from the first launcher (T1-T7) of the pair and, in the event the clay from the first launcher (T1-T7) is hit, causing the shooter (13) to file at the clay from the second launcher (T1-T7) of the pair; in the event that the first and second clays are hit, repeating the steps of selecting a pair of launchers (T1-T7), causing lauching of clays and causing the shooter (13) to fire either for the given pair of launchers (T1-T7) or from another pair of launchers (T1-T7) of the plurality until a predetermined number of clays have been discharged from some or all of the launchers (T1-T7) or all the discharged clays have been hit, or according to some other criteria.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 11/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806997 A1 19980219; AT 228235 T 20021215; EP 0922194 A1 19990616; EP 0922194 B1 20021120; GB 9617036 D0 19960925

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040813

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-07-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228235 T 20021215

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990825

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DK ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE