Global Patent Index - EP 0922315 B1

EP 0922315 B1 2000-05-24 - ELECTROMECHANICAL CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTROMECHANICAL CONNECTING DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMECHANISCHE VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 0922315 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942880 A

Priority

  • DE 29615005 U
  • EP 9704656 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6231349B1] An electromechanical connecting device can be connected to a switching device provided with switching magnets, arranged on a working carriage and connectable to a current source by means of current supply contacts, and can also be connected to a triggering device provided with triggering magnets and electrically connectable to a consumer. These switching magnets can be moved from a rest position to a working position against a restoring force, establishing a contact among pairs of contacts and thus an electric connection between the means of a special coding together with the triggering magnets arranged in the triggering device to generate particular magnetic fields for the switching process. In the switching device, at least one safety part designed as a safety magnet or ferromagnetic material can be moved in the direction of the triggering device from a rest position into a live position by a matching magnet or ferromagnetic part arranged in the triggering device, so that when the safety part returns to its rest position it causes a intentional short-circuit between the poles of the pair of contracts of the switching divide even when the triggering device is removed, whereas the working carriage remains in the live state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703; H01R 13/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/639 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7037 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29615005 U1 19961121; AU 4455897 A 19980319; EP 0922315 A1 19990616; EP 0922315 B1 20000524; ES 2149007 T3 20001016; JP 2000517097 A 20001219; JP 3886540 B2 20070228; US 6231349 B1 20010515; WO 9809346 A1 19980305

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160811

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160902

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080827

2009-04-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149007

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. FRANCO CICOGNA

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701779

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990716

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990316

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE