Global patent index - EP 0922396 A3

EP 0922396 A3 2000-01-26 - Device for detecting the tobacco temperature during cigarette manufacturing

Title (en)

Device for detecting the tobacco temperature during cigarette manufacturing

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Erfassen der Tabaktemperatur bei der Zigarettenherstellung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour détecter la température du tabac durant la fabrication des cigarettes

Publication

EP 0922396 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122602 A

Priority

DE 19754850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922396A2] The system has a primary element (39) for determining the temperature of a medium standing in reciprocal effect by temperature exchange, with the tobacco passing through the manufacturing process. The primary element is designed for determining the temperature of the processing air in the distributor of a cigarette extrusion machine, taking part at the build up of a tobacco line (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/18; A24C 5/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2006.01); A24C 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/1871 (2013.01); A24C 5/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922396 A2 19990616; EP 0922396 A3 20000126; DE 19754850 A1 19990617; JP H11235166 A 19990831; PL 330059 A1 19990621

INPADOC legal status

2001-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI