Global Patent Index - EP 0922400 B1

EP 0922400 B1 2002-11-27 - Footsupport

Title (en)

Footsupport

Title (de)

Fussbett

Title (fr)

Support de pied

Publication

EP 0922400 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113237 A

Priority

DE 19754730 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922400A1] The parts of the sole not possessing studs, spikes or nails has convex protuberances leading to the upper side. The reinforcement sole (6) consists of elastically deformable material. Near the spikes, studs or nails are indentations (2,3,4) pointing towards the underside and filled with soft padding material (7) to the top of the foot-support (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/12; A43B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/10 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922400 A1 19990616; EP 0922400 B1 20021127; AT 228319 T 20021215; DE 19754730 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59806436

2018-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170731

2018-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170716

2018-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180330

2018-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 228319 T

- Effective date: 20170716

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STUMPF, JUERGEN

- Free text: STUMPF, JUERGEN#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 23#D-36037 FULDA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- STUMPF, JUERGEN#BAHNHOFSTRASSE 23#D-36037 FULDA (DE)

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806436 20030109

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PPS POLYVALENT PATENT SERVICE AG

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228319 T 20021215

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

2000-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI