Global Patent Index - EP 0922410 A3

EP 0922410 A3 2000-11-29 - Method and device for controlling an adjustable table

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling an adjustable table

Title (de)

Kontrollverfahren und Kontrollvorrichtung für einen einstellbaren Tisch

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de contrôle d'une table ajustable

Publication

EP 0922410 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98850190 A

Priority

SE 9704603 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922410A2] In a method of controlling a table (1) having at least one element (2), whose position is adjustable by means of an actuator (4) which is actuated by a control means, a computer (5) neighbouring the table is used as control means. The computer is primarily intended to be used for other purposes, but is provided with a connection (8) for the actuator (4), and with a control program for actuating the actuator (4). An adjusting device comprises the control means (5) with the aid of which a desired setting of the table (1) is determinable, and the actuator (4), which is adapted to carry out the setting determined with the aid of the control means (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/00 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922410 A2 19990616; EP 0922410 A3 20001129; SE 9704603 D0 19971210; SE 9704603 L 19990611

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI