Global Patent Index - EP 0922422 B1

EP 0922422 B1 2001-05-23 - Roll of napkins

Title (en)

Roll of napkins

Title (de)

Endlosserviette

Title (fr)

Rouleau de serviettes

Publication

EP 0922422 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122570 A

Priority

DE 19754856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922422A1] The continuous paper napkin is of a tissue material wound into a roll. The tissue is smooth, has a number of layers, and is printed on one or both sides. Perforated lines are across the paper web, at intervals, for paper napkins to be torn off as required. The printing is pref. in four colours, and the gap between the perforated lines is pref. equal to the paper width.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 11/00 (2006.01); A47G 23/03 (2006.01); A47K 10/16 (2006.01); B31F 1/07 (2006.01); B31F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); A47G 11/001 (2013.01); A47G 23/0303 (2013.01); A47K 10/16 (2013.01); B31F 5/02 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0797 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821626 U1 19990218; AT 201312 T 20010615; EP 0922422 A1 19990616; EP 0922422 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031124

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801362 20011004

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201312 T 20010615

2001-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990824

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI