Global Patent Index - EP 0922512 A4

EP 0922512 A4 2000-08-09 - ELECTROMAGNETIC BRAKING DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING MOLD AND METHOD OF CONTINUOUS CASTING BY USING THE SAME

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC BRAKING DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS CASTING MOLD AND METHOD OF CONTINUOUS CASTING BY USING THE SAME

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE BREMSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STRANGGIESSKOKILLE UND STRANGGIESSVERFAHREN, BEI DEM DIESE VERWENDET WIRD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE POUR MOULE DE COULEE CONTINUE ET PROCEDE DE COULEE CONTINUE UTILISANT CE DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 0922512 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98921807 A

Priority

  • JP 9802297 W
  • JP 13962397 A
  • JP 13962497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922512A1] In a magnetic brake apparatus for a continuous casting mold having a pair of first and second upper electromagnets 17A and 17B which are oppositely placed near the rear faces of the opposing side walls of the continuous casting mold 10, and a pair of first and second lower electromagnets 21A and 21B which are oppositely placed thereunder, a static magnetic field being generated between each pair of electromagnets to stem the stream of the molten steel supplied to the casting mold by the static magnetic field, the apparatus has controlling units which independently control a current supplied to magnetic coils 16A and 16B being constituents of the first and second upper electromagnets and a current supplied to magnetic coils 20A and 20B being constituents of the first and second lower electromagnets. The intensity of the magnetic field between the magnetic poles of the upper and lower electromagnets can, thereby, be readily and inexpensively varied during casting without restriction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/115 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/115 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9853936A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922512 A1 19990616; EP 0922512 A4 20000809; AU 716170 B2 20000217; AU 7451098 A 19981230; BR 9804939 A 19990908; CA 2261142 A1 19981203; CN 1234756 A 19991110; KR 20000029610 A 20000525; TW 404866 B 20000911; US 2002005267 A1 20020117; WO 9853936 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020625

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-08-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990518

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE