Global Patent Index - EP 0922545 A3

EP 0922545 A3 2000-09-06 - Apparatus for punching a web-like or a sheet-like material and method for manufacturing a support plate

Title (en)

Apparatus for punching a web-like or a sheet-like material and method for manufacturing a support plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Stanzen von bandförmigen und bogenförmigen Material und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Trägerplatte

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour poinçonner un matériau en forme de bande ou feuille et procédé de fabrication d'une plaque de support

Publication

EP 0922545 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122343 A

Priority

DE 19754376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754376C1] The machine for stamping cardboard has a platen area in which a strip steel section is overlaid on an adjustably mounted support plate. An opposing stamp plate carries a stamp etching on its surface opposing the platen area. The carrier plate (18) has a base plate (24) with at least one hard metal plate which is pressure stable and resistant to mechanical forces. The carrier plate can have two hard metal plates on both side of the base plate. The hard metal plates can be made of a corrosion resistant material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/20; B26F 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/20 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26F 1/40 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754376 C1 19981224; AT 215432 T 20020415; EP 0922545 A2 19990616; EP 0922545 A3 20000906; EP 0922545 B1 20020403; ES 2175592 T3 20021116

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZIMMEL, JUERGEN, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ZIMMEL, JUERGEN, DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-06-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150601

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 215432 T

- Effective date: 20121125

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101125

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175592 T3

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215432 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI