Global patent index - EP 0922547 A3

EP 0922547 A3 2001-03-14 - Apparatus for manufacturing window frame members

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing window frame members

Title (de)

Maschine zum Bearbeiten von Fensterrahmen-Holmen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de châssis de fenêtres

Publication

EP 0922547 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121890 A

Priority

DE 19752685 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922547A2] The machine has a transverse support (3) positioned above at least one longitudinal guide (1,2) with machining units (4-6) inside an operating compartment (20,21). The machining units travel on top of, to the side of, and beside the guide which extends on both sides away from the transverse support with guide sections (9,10;11,12) of equal length matching the long side of the squared timbers (18) being machined. A carriage (14) holding a piece of timber each is mounted on the longitudinal guide. Each carriage is moved in the operating chamber until its first end is positioned and stationary for machining. The second end of the piece of timber is moved into the second guide section and machined while stationary. The carriage is then retracted into the first guide section and the long side of the piece of timber machined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 1/08; B23Q 1/01; B27C 9/04; B27F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/02 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 1/08 (2013.01); B27F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922547 A2 19990616; EP 0922547 A3 20010314; EP 0922547 B1 20050511; EP 0922547 B8 20050706; DE 19752685 A1 19990701; ES 2241091 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071118

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061120

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061120

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-10-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2241091

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812784

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: IMA KLESSMANN GMBH HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 27M 1/08 A, 7B 27F 1/02 B, 7B 27C 9/04 B, 7B 23Q 1/01 B

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI