Global patent index - EP 0922551 A3

EP 0922551 A3 2000-03-01 - Stone milling machine with rotating milling tool having percusive action

Title (en)

Stone milling machine with rotating milling tool having percusive action

Title (de)

Fräsmaschine mit rotierendem Fräswerkzeug mit Schlagwirkung für gesteinsartige Materialien

Title (fr)

Machine de fraisage de pierre à outil rotatif ayant une action percutante

Publication

EP 0922551 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123221 A

Priority

DE 19754371 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6203113B1] A rotatable cutting drum to be mounted on a machine for mining or for milling a surface such as a roadway. The drum is equipped with a set of movable bits or chisels which impact on the surface to be cut. The movable bits or chisels are impacted by pendulums mounted on a rotating cylinder mounted inside of the drum so that a percussive force is generated to assist cutting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23C 1/02 (2006.01); B28D 1/18 (2006.01); E01C 23/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/181 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6203113 B1 20010320; CZ 9803943 A3 19990811; EA 001282 B1 20001225; EA 199800994 A2 19990826; EA 199800994 A3 19991229; EP 0922551 A2 19990616; EP 0922551 A3 20000301; JP H11235614 A 19990831; PL 330181 A1 19990621; TR 9802480 A2 19990621

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020425

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 19981223

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981223;SI

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981223;SI