Global Patent Index - EP 0922580 A3

EP 0922580 A3 2000-03-29 - Color control system for a printing press

Title (en)

Color control system for a printing press

Title (de)

Farbkontrollsystem für eine Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de contrôle de couleur pour une presse à imprimer

Publication

EP 0922580 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309181 A

Priority

US 6503797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922580A2] A system and method for controlling the ink feed in a printing press in order to achieve and maintain target values of color. More particularly, the invention relates to a system for controlling the ink control devices using an adaptive controller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0027 (2013.01); B41F 33/0045 (2013.01); B41P 2233/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922580 A2 19990616; EP 0922580 A3 20000329; JP H11207931 A 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2001-01-03 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20001013

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK FI FR GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB IT NL

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI