Global Patent Index - EP 0922659 B1

EP 0922659 B1 2002-11-06 - Method and device for feeding sheets

Title (en)

Method and device for feeding sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Bogen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour alimenter des feuilles

Publication

EP 0922659 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122913 A

Priority

DE 19755518 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922659A1] Sheets of paper are lifted singly from the top of a pile by suction pads (7) and are moved by transport suction pads (8) between a pair of rollers (12, 19) where they are deposited on a conveyer belt (14) moving between two rollers (12, 13). On reaching a marker (4) the sheets of paper are released to another machine (21). The speeds at which the transport suction pads and the conveyer belt move within each cycle, varies in accordance with a predetermined profile. The sheet is transferred from the suction pad to the conveyer belt with the acceleration close to zero.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 7/20; B65H 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 7/20 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/0816 (2013.01); B65H 5/06 (2013.01); B65H 7/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922659 A1 19990616; EP 0922659 B1 20021106; DE 19755518 A1 19990624; DE 19755518 C2 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161202

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161202

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806175

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59806175

2005-05-04 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20030725

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806175 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020402

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI