Global Patent Index - EP 0922800 B1

EP 0922800 B1 2002-09-04 - Improved weft-thread transport unit for a needle-weaving loom

Title (en)

Improved weft-thread transport unit for a needle-weaving loom

Title (de)

Schussfadentransportvorrichtung für eine Greiferwebmaschine

Title (fr)

Installation de transport de fil de trame pour un métier à tisser à griffes

Publication

EP 0922800 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98122575 A

Priority

IT MI972751 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922800A1] A weft-thread transport unit for needle-weaving looms comprising an endless belt (1), trapezoidal in cross-section, fitted between a driver roller whose effective diameter is varied by two conical disks (2, 2') and an idler roller (4), the weft thread A being made to adhere to the belt (1) by means of a pressure element (9, 90, 90'). The two disks (2, 2') which comprise the driver roller are both axially mobile against the action of substantially equal elastic elements (12, 12') and the belt presents on the parts in contact with the rollers one or more blocking elements smaller than the width of the belt which are engaged by corresponding flanges on the external surfaces of the driver and idler rollers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/10 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 51/10 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922800 A1 19990616; EP 0922800 B1 20020904; DE 69807639 D1 20021010; DE 69807639 T2 20030807; ES 2178805 T3 20030101; IT 1296959 B1 19990803; IT MI972751 A1 19990614

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101203

2011-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091204

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807639

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-09-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: COMEZ S.P.A.

- Free text: COMAT S.R.L.#VIA COLLI ROCCO, 5#27024 CILAVEGNA (PAVIA) (IT) -TRANSFER TO- COMEZ S.P.A.#VIA ENRICO FERMI 5#CILAVEGNA (PV) (IT)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178805 T3

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807639 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMAT S.R.L.

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020514

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990430

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

1999-07-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OFFICINA MECCANICA COMAT S.A.S. DI BONASCHI & C.

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI