Global Patent Index - EP 0922802 B1

EP 0922802 B1 2002-09-18 - Warp beam stand for superimposed warp beams and wide loom with such warp beam stand

Title (en)

Warp beam stand for superimposed warp beams and wide loom with such warp beam stand

Title (de)

Kettbaumgestell für übereinander angeordnete Kettbäume und Breitwebmaschine mit Kettbaumgestell

Title (fr)

Support d'ensouple pour ensouples superposées et métier à tisser de grande largeur équipé avec un tel support d'ensouple

Publication

EP 0922802 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810956 A

Priority

EP 97810956 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922802A1] The warp beam frame, for a wide loom, has mountings for warp beams over each other. The upper bearing mounting (24) to hold a warp beam has two end mountings (26), and at least one support mounting (27) which swings on the frame. The swing movement of the support mounting (27) can give a free space for a warp beam change. The lower warp beam mounting (25) has two end mountings and a fixed support mounting (27). A deflection beam (29), at the upper support mounting (27), gives a working contact surface for the warps. The carrier (32), where the support mounting (27) is attached, has two mounting shields (30) where the carrier is moved through linkages. A carrier tube can rotate on side sections which also support the upper warp beam mounting, with each support mounting at the carrier tube. Two carriers are at the carrier tube, with an adjustable carrier tube at the carriers. A warp tensioner is at the carrier tube, with a setting mechanism which is against a hub at one side and is linked to the carrier tube at the other side to position the deflector beam to set the warp tension. A system gives support to the support mounting for the bearing mounting assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922802 A1 19990616; EP 0922802 B1 20020918; DE 59708276 D1 20021024; US 6041830 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2004-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULZER TEXTIL A.G.

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708276 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2000-03-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-03-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH LI

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI