Global Patent Index - EP 0922812 A3

EP 0922812 A3 2000-02-02 - Conveying system for a two-phase flow

Title (en)

Conveying system for a two-phase flow

Title (de)

Förderanlage für eine Zweiphasenströmung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transfert pour un écoulement diphasique

Publication

EP 0922812 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204191 A

Priority

NL 1007763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922812A2] A conveyor system for a two-phase flow, such as water containing sand, gravel and the like, comprising at least one conveyor pipeline (1) with means (2) for generating a flow, characterized in that the internal surface of the conveyor line bears guide means (7) for influencing the flow. A pump (2) is accommodated in the conveyor pipeline, and the guide means (7) are situated immediately upstream of the inlet of the pump. In case the pump is a rotary pump, the guide means are designed to impart a preliminary rotation to the flow. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/90 (2006.01); E02F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 7/10 (2013.01); E02F 3/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922812 A2 19990616; EP 0922812 A3 20000202; NL 1007763 C2 19990623

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050329

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB NL

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI